Mental Multiplication Strategies Maths Grade 3 | Orchids
Job Alert : To view our Careers Page Click Here X
info@orchids.edu.in (+91) 8-888-888-999
ORCHIDS The International School

Mental Math

Mental Multiplication Strategies

Mental math is a skill that helps students to do math in their heads without using paper and pencil.

  • Mental Math is useful in school and everyday life.
  • It also helps to do calculations faster.

In multiplication,

  • The number with which we multiply is called the multiplicand.
  • The number which is multiplied by the multiplicand is called the multiplier
  • The result of a multiplication is called the product.
G3_1_MM_BOY

Method 1:

  • Multiply each number from left to right with the multiplier. Let us discuss with an example.

Example :

a) 42 × 7

Answer:

G3_2_MM_Answer

Method 2:

  • Round off the multiplicand to the nearest ten
  • Then do the multiplication
  • After that, multiply the reduced or additional value of the rounded off number with the multiplier.
  • Then subtract/add the product from the previous one. Let us discuss with examples.

Example :

a) 78 × 3

b) 44 × 6

Answer:

a) 78 × 3 = (80 – 2) × 3

G3_3_MM_Answer

b) 44 × 6 = (40 + 4) × 6

G3_4_MM_Answer

Method 3:

  • Split the multiplier into factors.
  • Multiply the numbers multiplicand with the first factor
  • Then multiply the product of the previous multiplication with the second factor.
  • Continue the same process with all the factors.
  • Let us discuss with examples.

Example :

a) 24 × 8

b) 25 × 44

Answer:

a)

24 × 8  = 24 × 2 × 4
 = 48 × 4 =

G3_5_MM_Answer

So, 24 × 8 = 192

b)

25 × 44 = 25 × 4 × 11
 = 100 × 11 = 1100

So, 25 × 44 = 1100


Method 4:

  • Break the multiplier as the sum/difference of the nearest ten/ hundred and a one-digit number.
  • Multiply by each from right to left.
  • Add the individuals to get the final answer.
  • Let us discuss with examples.

Example :

a) 46 × 12

b) 23 × 18

Answer:

a) 46 × 12 = 46 × (10 + 2) =

G3_6_MM_Answer

So, 46 × 12 = 552

b) 23 × 18 = 23 × (20 - 2)

G3_7_MM_Answer

So, 23 × 18 = 414


Method 5:

  • Round up the multiplier to the nearest hundred.
  • Multiply the rounded-up value and the amount rounded up from left to right.
  • Subtract the products

Example :

27 × 96

Answer:

27 × 96 = 27 × (100 – 4)

G3_8_MM_Answer

Method 6:

  • Express both the multiplier and multiplicand as the sum of the nearest ten and a one/ two digit.
  • Now multiply and add.

Example :

35 × 22

Answer:

35 = (30 + 5)

22 = (20 + 2)

G3_9_MM_Answer

Hence, 35 × 22 = 770

G3_10_MM_Did you know

G3_11_MM_Mindmap
  • -

    Admission Enquiry

    A Journey To A Better Future Begins With Us